+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 003-004-000
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/10-21.9 - from Ch. 122, par. 10-21.9
+ − Vote
March 13, 2019: HB3322 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor