+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 22, 2011 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0176
- Effective Date July 22, 2011
- Governor Approved
On June 10, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 6, 2011
- Second Reading
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2011
- Do Pass Labor; 009-000-000
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2011
- Arrive in Senate
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Small Business Empowerment & Workforce Development Committee; 016-000-000
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Small Business Empowerment & Workforce Development Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell