+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On November 6, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
On November 4, 2003 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Ricca Slone; Motion #2
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Accept Motion Recommends Be Not Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On October 27, 2003 in the House:
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Rules Committee
On October 23, 2003 in the House:
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Rep. Ricca Slone
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 4, 2003
On August 8, 2003 in the House:
- Governor Amendatory Veto
On June 11, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2003
- Referred to Rules
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-003-000
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ricca Slone
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that as much as possible in collecting data on community based programs, the Bureau of the Budget shall rely on existing reporting forms used by direct service providers.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 15 ILCS 20/50-5 - was 15 ILCS 20/38
- 20 ILCS 3005/6.5 new -
- 15 ILCS 405/6.05 new -