+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 5 ILCS 140/2 - from Ch. 116, par. 202
- 5 ILCS 140/3 - from Ch. 116, par. 203
- 5 ILCS 140/9.5 -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor