+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Remains in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 002-007-000
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Remains in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that the court may, in its discretion, award a plaintiff who prevails (instead of the prevailing party) reasonable attorney's fees in any action by a private citizen to restrain the defendant from disbursing public funds of the State. Provides that these changes apply to all actions commenced or pending (instead of filed) on or after the effective date.
+ − Statute Amended
- 735 ILCS 5/11-303 - from Ch. 110, par. 11-303
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor