+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 4 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 5 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
- House Committee Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
+ − Proposed Amendments (5)
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -