+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
- Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto August 12, 2015
- Governor Vetoed
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015
- Do Pass Human Services; 005-000-000
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
- Assigned to Human Services
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 29, 2015
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that a Children and Family Services Advisory Council of 20 members shall be appointed by the Governor (rather than a Children and Family Services Advisory Council of 17 members, one of whom shall be a senior citizen age 60 or over, shall be appointed by the Governor). Provides that the Council shall advise the Department of Children and Family Services with respect to services and programs for children under its care (rather than for children and adults under its care). Provides that beginning July 1, 2015, the Advisory Council shall include as appointed members at least one youth from each of the Department's regional youth advisory boards established pursuant to the Department of Children and Family Services Statewide Youth Advisory Board Act and at least 2 adult former wards of the Department of Children and Family Services. Provides that at its first meeting the Council shall select a chairperson (rather than chairman) from among its members and appoint a committee to draft rules of procedure. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 5/5-535 - was 20 ILCS 5/6.15