+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- To General Law Subcommittee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor