+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (48)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0986
- Effective Date June 1, 2009
- Governor Certifies Changes
- Returned to Governor for Certification
- Both Houses Accepted Amendatory Veto
- Accept Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 055-000-000
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Approved for Consideration Rules
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Rules
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto September 23, 2008
- Accept Amendatory Veto - House Passed 113-000-000
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Accept Motion Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto September 10, 2008
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Rules Committee
- Governor Amendatory Veto
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2008
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2008
- Do Pass Higher Education; 007-000-000
- Assigned to Higher Education
- First Reading
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 10, 2008
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Illinois Health Policy Center Act. Creates the Illinois Health Policy Center within the University of Illinois, to be sponsored by the University of Illinois at Chicago College of Medicine and the University of Illinois Institute of Government and Public Affairs. Provides that the goals of the Center are to support legislators and other government officials in developing and implementing health policy to address critical issues facing the State of Illinois and to focus on identifying "best practices" appropriate for Illinois through careful and objective review of the latest scientific research and through comparative analyses of other states' policies. Sets forth duties of the Center, including: responding to requests from State government officials and agencies requiring analytical support and guidance in matters related to the development and implementation of health policy; identifying critical issues in health policy in need of timely action; developing and sponsoring educational programs; and pursuing a research agenda that focuses on State health care policy. Creates the Illinois Health Policy Center Advisory Panel, appointed by the legislative leaders and the Governor, to provide advice and oversight concerning the creation and operation of the Illinois Health Policy Center.
+ − Statute Amended
- 110 ILCS 520/1 - from Ch. 144, par. 651