+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/24-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 24-3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor