+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney