+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
+ − Statutes Amended (24)
- 5 ILCS 140/7.5
- 20 ILCS 2605/2605-304 new
- 20 ILCS 2605/2605-605
- 30 ILCS 105/5.935 new
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-99
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-124 new
- 430 ILCS 65/1.1 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-1.1
- 430 ILCS 65/3 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-3
- 430 ILCS 65/3a - from Ch. 38, par. 83-3a
- 430 ILCS 65/3.1 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-3.1
- 430 ILCS 65/4 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-4
- 430 ILCS 65/5 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-5
- 430 ILCS 65/7 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-7
- 430 ILCS 65/7.5 new
- 430 ILCS 65/8 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-8
- 430 ILCS 65/8.4 new
- 430 ILCS 65/9.5
- 430 ILCS 65/14 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-14
- 430 ILCS 66/13 new
- 430 ILCS 66/30
- 430 ILCS 66/50
- 720 ILCS 5/24-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 24-3
- 725 ILCS 5/110-10 - from Ch. 38, par. 110-10
- 730 ILCS 5/5-6-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-6-3
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor