+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- New Act -
- 225 ILCS 85/4 - from Ch. 111, par. 4124
- 225 ILCS 120/15 - from Ch. 111, par. 8301-15
- 320 ILCS 50/10 -
- 410 ILCS 620/16 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 516
- 720 ILCS 570/102 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1102
- 740 ILCS 20/3 - from Ch. 70, par. 903