+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 625 ILCS 5/1-105.2 -
- 625 ILCS 5/3-400 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-400
- 625 ILCS 5/6-306.5 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-306.5
- 625 ILCS 5/11-208 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-208
- 625 ILCS 5/11-208.3 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-208.3
- 625 ILCS 5/11-208.8 -
- 625 ILCS 5/11-208.6 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 805/8.43 new -
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor