+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed revised
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 11, 2003 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ralph C. Capparelli
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard T. Bradley
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 40 ILCS 5/5-132 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 5-132
- 40 ILCS 5/5-148 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 5-148
- 30 ILCS 805/8.27 new -