+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. David McSweeney
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. David McSweeney
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-004-005
- 60 Votes Required
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Unlimited Debate
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Provides that the amendatory Act is operative on January 1, 2021 (instead of January 1, 2020).
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 625 ILCS 5/11-208 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-208
- 625 ILCS 5/11-208.6 -
- 30 ILCS 805/8.43 new -
+ − Votes (2)
February 26, 2020: HB0322 - Third Reading
February 5, 2020: HB0322 - Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor