+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary; Rep. Jim Durkin
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Motion Withdrawn Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
- Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary; Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1.1 - from Ch. 38, par. 24-1.1
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1.6 -
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1.8 -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-6-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-6-3
- 730 ILCS 5/5-5-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-5-3
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor