+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (38)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Fiscal Note Filed
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Blaine Wilhour
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-006-000
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2022: HFA0003 - Judiciary - Criminal
March 26, 2021: HB3215 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor