+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor