+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0256
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015
- Second Reading
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2015
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 16, 2015
- Arrive in Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-003-000
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/12-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 12-2
+ − Votes (4)
May 19, 2015: HB3184 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 19, 2015
April 29, 2015: HB3184 - Criminal Law - Apr 29, 2015
April 15, 2015: HB3184 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 15, 2015
March 24, 2015: HB3184 - Judiciary - Criminal - Mar 24, 2015
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor