+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0161
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 18, 2017
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
- Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
- Referred to Assignments
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 018-000-000
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 26, 2017: HB3179 - Third Reading
May 3, 2017: HB3179 - State Government
March 16, 2017: HB3179 - Third Reading
March 8, 2017: HB3179 - Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor