+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 21, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On May 19, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-000-000
On May 16, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 15, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 012-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that, notwithstanding any other law to the contrary, the Teachers Health Insurance Security Fund is not subject to sweeps, administrative charge-backs, or any other fiscal or budgetary maneuver that would in any way transfer any amounts from the Teachers Health Insurance Security Fund into any other fund of the State. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 ILCS 375/1 - from Ch. 127, par. 521
+ − Vote
May 19, 2008: HB3177 - Third Reading - Monday, May 19, 2008
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor