+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0160
- Effective Date January 1, 2018
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
- Do Pass Transportation; 015-000-000
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-014-000
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/13-109 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 13-109
+ − Votes (4)
May 25, 2017: HB3172 - Third Reading
May 9, 2017: HB3172 - Transportation
April 4, 2017: HB3172 - Third Reading
March 22, 2017: HB3172 - Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor