+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 20, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0288
- Effective Date August 20, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 21, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-002-001
On May 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2007
- Second Reading
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2007
- Do Pass Environment and Energy; 010-000-000
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment and Energy
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 2, 2007
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 112-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 018-004-000
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. James H. Meyer
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Tryon
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 415 ILCS 5/39 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1039
- 415 ILCS 5/39.2 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1039.2
- 415 ILCS 115/Act rep. -