+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2013
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christine Radogno
- Assigned to Executive
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 011-000-000
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/5-1 - from Ch. 122, par. 5-1
+ − Vote
April 9, 2013: HB3152 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 09, 2013
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor