+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/11-1.20 - was 720 ILCS 5/12-13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor