+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (72)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0639
- Effective Date August 22, 2005
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 089-025-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-000-001
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Arrived in House
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 046-010-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2005
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2005
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 19, 2005
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-025-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 013-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Fiscal Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1,2
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. William B. Black
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. William B. Black
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
- Re-assigned to Executive Committee
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana A Mendoza
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Reinserts the bill with the following changes: Provides that the bill may be referred to as the Anna Cieslewicz Act. In the new Act, exempts farm dogs from the requirement that they be registered and that a fee be collected upon their registration. Requires the Department of Public Health to award grants to counties and municipalities that offer sterilization services. Requires that 20% of the special fund be set aside for those grants. In the Animal Control Act, removes the requirement that a county board require registration of dogs and cats. Exempts farm dogs from any registration required by a county. Removes the change to the State Mandates Act.
House Floor Amendment No. 2
Repeals the new Act December 31, 2012. Makes conforming changes in the amendatory provisions of the other Acts.
House Floor Amendment No. 3
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Illinois Public Health and Safety Animal Population Control Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to at least partially reimburse veterinarians for the rabies immunization or sterilization of dogs and cats owned by eligible low-income persons. Funds the program through an income tax check-off, fees from Pet Friendly license plates, and various fines imposed under the Animal Control Act. Amends the Animal Control Act. Makes various changes to impose the additional fees, further regulate dangerous dogs, and promote county animal population control programs. Amends the State Finance Act, the Illinois Income Tax Act, and the Illinois Vehicles Code to make conforming changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- New Act -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.640 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/8h -
- 35 ILCS 5/507EE new -
- 510 ILCS 5/3 - from Ch. 8, par. 353
- 30 ILCS 805/8.29 new -