+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 17, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0378
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
- Governor Approved
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 036-018-000
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015
- Second Reading
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-001-000
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2015
- Arrive in Senate
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-020-000
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 26, 2015: HB3149 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 26, 2015
May 6, 2015: HB3149 - Criminal Law - May 06, 2015
April 16, 2015: HB3149 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 16, 2015
March 17, 2015: HB3149 - Judiciary - Criminal - Mar 17, 2015
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor