+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 4, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0409
- Effective Date August 4, 2003
- Governor Approved
On June 11, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 27, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 25, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 5 ILCS 325/1 - from Ch. 129, par. 501
- 5 ILCS 325/1.1 new -
- 30 ILCS 805/8.27 new -
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2003: HB3141 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 13, 2003
March 25, 2003: HB3141 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 25, 2003
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor