+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 18, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0740
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2008
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2008
- Do Pass Environment and Energy; 009-000-000
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment and Energy
On May 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 17, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On May 15, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. James H. Meyer
On May 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Computer Technology Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Computer Technology Committee
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Harry R. Ramey, Jr.
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Computer Technology Committee; 004-000-000
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Computer Technology Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry R. Ramey, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Eliminate the Digital Divide Law. Provides that senior citizen homes may receive grants under Community Technology Center Grant Program. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity must annually provide the Director of Central Management Services with a list of Community Technology Centers that have applied to the Department for funding as the recipients of surplus State-owned computer hardware equipment. Makes other changes.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 30 ILCS 605/7 - from Ch. 127, par. 133b10
- 30 ILCS 780/5-110 new -
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2008: HB0314 - Third Reading - Friday, May 23, 2008
May 15, 2007: HB0314 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 15, 2007
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor