+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- To Economic Growth and Modernization Subcommittee
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Economic Development & Housing Committee
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor