+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0156
- Effective Date January 1, 2018
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2017
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-012-001
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia