+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John A. Fritchey
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 21, 2003: HB3134 - Third Reading - Friday, March 21, 2003
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor