+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0103
- Effective Date July 19, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 034-015-000
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
- Do Pass Human Services; 006-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2019
- Arrive in Senate
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-025-000
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 016-000-000
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 305 ILCS 5/4-2 - from Ch. 23, par. 4-2
- 305 ILCS 5/4-21 -
- 305 ILCS 5/9A-7 - from Ch. 23, par. 9A-7
- 305 ILCS 5/12-4.11 - from Ch. 23, par. 12-4.11
+ − Votes (4)
May 17, 2019: HB3129 - Third Reading
May 7, 2019: HB3129 - Human Services
April 4, 2019: HB3129 - Third Reading
March 27, 2019: HB3129 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor