+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (52)
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Forby
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this Amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2016
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Gary Forby
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015
- Do Pass Transportation; 020-000-000
- Assigned to Transportation
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-002-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. In provisions concerning authorized fines, provides that an additional penalty is imposed in sentencing for an offense concerning vehicle wheel and axle loads and gross weights of $15 for each $40 of the first $330, or fraction thereof, of fine imposed for a violation and $10 for each subsequent $40, or fraction thereof, of fine imposed for a violation following the initial $15 surcharge for each $40 of the first $330 of fine imposed (rather than an additional penalty of $15 for each $40, or fraction thereof, of fine imposed). Effective immediately.
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Boat Registration and Safety Act. Provides that a boating safety certificate is not required for a person who is temporarily using the waters of this State for the purpose of participating in a boat racing event sanctioned by the Department of Natural Resources or authorized federal agency. Requires the organizer or holder of the sanctioned event to possess liability insurance for property damage and personal injury or death with a minimum benefit of $1,000,000 that shall remain in effect through the entirety of the event. Effective Immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 625 ILCS 45/5-18 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 315-13
- 730 ILCS 5/5-9-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-9-1