+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 15, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-Referred to Rules Committee
On April 8, 2005 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David Reis
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
On March 15, 2005 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Reis
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/12-803 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 12-803
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor