+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0155
- Effective Date August 18, 2017
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2017
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017
- Arrive in Senate
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 225 ILCS 470/40 - from Ch. 147, par. 140
- 225 ILCS 470/56.1 - from Ch. 147, par. 156.1
+ − Votes (3)
May 25, 2017: HB3121 - Third Reading
March 30, 2017: HB3121 - Third Reading
March 14, 2017: HB3121 - Agriculture & Conservation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor