+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 009-001-000
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Changes the applicability of the section to Will County and Kane County (currently, counties with a population between 500,000 and 700,000 inhabitants).