+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
On January 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 4, 2023
On November 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On October 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)(ii) this bill shall not be re-referred to the Committee on Assignment pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
On August 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading August 31, 2021
On August 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 15, 2021
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2021
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Revenue; 011-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2021
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 017-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-001
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 003
Further amends the Illinois Housing Development Act. In provisions concerning the affordable housing tax donation credit program, provides that, for property that is for sale to homeowners, the gross monthly income standard is based on 120% (currently, 60%) of the area median income.
House Amendment 001
Adds provisions to the introduced bill amending the Illinois Housing Development Act. Provides that the amount of tax credits reserved by the administrative housing agency for an approved project under the affordable housing tax donation credit program is limited to $32,850,352 in State fiscal years 2022 and 2023 and shall be increased by 5% in each fiscal year thereafter.
+ − Proposed Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 12, 2021: HB3107 - Revenue
April 22, 2021: HB3107 - Third Reading
April 22, 2021: HFA0003 - Revenue & Finance
March 25, 2021: HB3107 - Revenue & Finance
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor