+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0499
- Effective Date August 23, 2019
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 021-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Terra Costa Howard
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
- Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Postponed - Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
- Assigned to Human Services
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that the Department of Human Services may consult, rather than obtain approval of, the United States Department of Justice for the human trafficking recognition training program developed under the Act. Provides that the human trafficking recognition training program shall be developed and published no later than July 1, 2020, rather than January 1, 2020.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the contents of the introduced bill with changes. Limits the scope of the training requirement to employees who routinely interact with guests. Requires lodging establishments to provide its employees with training within 6 months of beginning employment and every 2 years thereafter. Provides for the Department of Human Services rather than the Department of Labor to administer the Act. Provides that a lodging establishment may use its own training curriculum or that of a third party if the curriculum meets minimum standards. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -