+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 5, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0249
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
- Second Reading
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021
- Do Pass Health; 011-002-000
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021
- Arrive in Senate
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 114-003-000
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (4)
May 25, 2021: HB0310 - Third Reading
May 11, 2021: HB0310 - Health
April 21, 2021: HB0310 - Third Reading
March 23, 2021: HB0310 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor