+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 16, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0197
- Effective Date August 16, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2007
- Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Local Government
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Local Government
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 23, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Local Government Committee; 010-000-000
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1005 - from Ch. 34, par. 5-1005