+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0278
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
- Do Pass Human Services; 007-000-000
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; 010-000-000
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; 016-000-000
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services (rather than the Department of Human Services) shall develop, in collaboration with a public university that has a Doctor of Pharmacy Professional Program and is located in a county with a population of more than 3,000,000 (rather than in collaboration with an academic institution), a program designed to provide prescribing physicians under the medical assistance program with an evidence-based, non-commercial source of the latest objective information about pharmaceuticals.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (5)
May 22, 2019: HB3097 - Third Reading
May 7, 2019: HB3097 - Human Services
April 10, 2019: HB3097 - Third Reading
April 4, 2019: HFA0001 - Prescription Drug Affordability
March 20, 2019: HB3097 - Prescription Drug Affordability
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor