+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ruth Munson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/14-13.01 - from Ch. 122, par. 14-13.01
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor