+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/3-14-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-14-1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor