+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-009-000
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Vote
March 13, 2019: HB3088 - Labor & Commerce
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor