+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 11, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0188
- Effective Date July 11, 2003
- Governor Approved
On June 11, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On April 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2003
- Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-003
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 009-000-000
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Biggins
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2003: HB3079 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 13, 2003
March 21, 2003: HB3079 - Third Reading - Friday, March 21, 2003
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor