+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 016-000-000
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Delgado
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 105 ILCS 5/14C-8 - from Ch. 122, par. 14C-8
- 105 ILCS 5/21-1 - from Ch. 122, par. 21-1
- 105 ILCS 5/21-2 - from Ch. 122, par. 21-2
+ − Vote
April 1, 2003: HB3073 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 01, 2003
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor