+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0112
- Effective Date August 15, 2017
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
- Second Reading
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2017
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
- Arrive in Senate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 505 ILCS 90/16 - from Ch. 5, par. 76
- 505 ILCS 90/4.01 rep. -
+ − Votes (3)
May 25, 2017: HB3058 - Third Reading
March 15, 2017: HB3058 - Third Reading
March 7, 2017: HB3058 - Agriculture & Conservation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor