+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 To
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Accountability and Ethics
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019
- Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 010-000-000
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics
- Re-referred to Assignments
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Referred to Assignments
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
- First Reading
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Tabled
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b) Rep. Rita Mayfield
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 008-000-000
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 15, 2019: HB3053 - Government Accountability/Pensions
March 28, 2019: HB3053 - Third Reading
March 13, 2019: HB3053 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor